+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A658a
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 409a
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.306
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.437
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Substance Abuse
+ − Votes (3)
January 24, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse)
- Yeas: 7
March 18, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 1, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse)
- Yeas: 7