+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1498
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (4)
January 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 10
April 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor