+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1133
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 4069a
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1193
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (5)
May 25, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 9
June 2, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 23
May 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor