+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1336
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor