+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.38
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.238
- Substituted For A5813
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1402
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor