+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.134
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.327
- Substituted For A5460
On February 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.235
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 2, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor