+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.222
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.300
- Substituted For A7511a
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 3991a
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1458
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 5, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor