+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1005
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3991c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3991b
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3991a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor