+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary