+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3977a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor