+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8136b
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 3966b
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.116
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 3966a
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.377
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (3)
January 11, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
May 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 22, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15