+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1609
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3957b
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1399
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3957a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 1
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor