+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.576
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor