+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.521
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3940a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.209
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
February 27, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
March 2, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
February 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor