+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.292
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.114
- Substituted For A5394a
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.830
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3906a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor