+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1853
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3893b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3893a
- Amend And Recommit To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 13, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor