+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.291
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.354
- Substituted For A5819
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1096
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor