+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.275
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
March 23, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor