+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7748a
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1423
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3855a
- Amend And Recommit To Elections
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.876
On January 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
May 11, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor