+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.678
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.333
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
March 20, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9