+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.892
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
May 24, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
March 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9