+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.123
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.151
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
March 26, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1