+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1142
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.506
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
May 8, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor