+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.263
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.357
- Substituted For A5820
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1300
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (3)
June 12, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 12, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
April 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor