+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities 1
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 3799a
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.549
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities 1
+ − Vote
March 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Cities 1)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor