+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.525
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1813
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
June 20, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 20, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor