+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.353
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.208
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
June 14, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9