+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to assembly
- Passed senate
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading (t) 3732c
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.943
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 3732b
- Amend and recommit to local government
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amend and recommit to local government
- Print number 3732a
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Returned to senate
- Died in assembly
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to assembly
- Passed senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading cal.1329
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
+ − Votes (7)
June 12, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 12, 2014
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 4
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: present
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: present
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: present
- Jeffrey D. Klein: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Malcolm A. Smith: present
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
May 28, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Finance - May 28, 2014
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: nay
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: nay
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
May 13, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - May 13, 2014
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
June 17, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 17, 2013
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: present
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
June 13, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 13, 2013
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: present
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Jeffrey D. Klein: yea
- Liz Krueger: nay
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: present
- Patty Ritchie: present
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: present
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Malcolm A. Smith: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
June 12, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 12, 2013
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: present
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
May 22, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - May 22, 2013
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea