+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.529
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Civil Service and Pensions - May 6, 2013
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: nay
May 6, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Civil Service and Pensions - May 6, 2013
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: nay
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor