+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a4741
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.339
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 3703b
- Amend and recommit to environmental conservation
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 3703a
- Amend and recommit to rules
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.285
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Environmental Conservation - Mar 25, 2014
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Environmental Conservation - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
April 16, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Environmental Conservation - Apr 16, 2013
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor