+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 370b
- Amend And Recommit To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1255
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 370a
- Amend And Recommit To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (4)
January 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 8
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 4
March 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor