+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 3671a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.490
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1303
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (5)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
March 28, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor