+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1050
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1071
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
May 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor