+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.340
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor