+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.157
On August 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.498
- Substituted For A6670b
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1339
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3658b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3658a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
June 13, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor