+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.986
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor