+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.221
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
+ − Vote
March 3, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Civil Service and Pensions - Mar 3, 2014
- Yeas: 10
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea