+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice Of Committee Consideration - Withdrawn
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice Of Committee Consideration - Requested
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3612a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation