+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.562
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.227
- Substituted For A4250
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.991
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor