+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.104
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.108
- Substituted For A10002b
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.679
On June 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3595c
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On June 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3595b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3595a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 21
June 8, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5
May 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor