+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to cities
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.691
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to cities
+ − Vote
May 21, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Cities - May 21, 2013
- Yeas: 6
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor