+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.705
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.105
- Substituted For A2122
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.265
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor