+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1389
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.566
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (4)
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 5, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor