+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1376
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1650
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (6)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11
June 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 3, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor