+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to assembly
- Passed senate
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.24
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Returned to senate
- Died in assembly
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to assembly
- Passed senate
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.836
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Apr 29, 2014
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 5
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: nay
- Martin Malavé Dilan: nay
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: nay
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Jeffrey D. Klein: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: nay
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Malcolm A. Smith: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: nay
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
January 14, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Investigations and Government Operations - Jan 14, 2014
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: nay
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
June 10, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 10, 2013
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: nay
- Martin Malavé Dilan: nay
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: nay
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Jeffrey D. Klein: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: present
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: nay
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Malcolm A. Smith: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: absent
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Investigations and Government Operations - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: present
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor