+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1240
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1291
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3543a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor