+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A3075a
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.896
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3535a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Vote
May 15, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor