+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 3526a
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.86
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Vote
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor