+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.167
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor