+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.104
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3520a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
January 30, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor